KY SB212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal, reenact, and amend KRS 164.004 to reorganize the Strategic Committee on Postsecondary Education and rename it the Strategic Committee on Higher Education; amend KRS 164.001, 164.013, and 164.020 to conform; confirm Executive Order 2019-029.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 902 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-07Housereturned to Education (H)
2019-03-07House1st reading
2019-03-07Housetaken from Education (H)
2019-03-06Houseposted in committee
2019-03-04Houseto Education (H)
2019-03-01Housereceived in House
2019-03-01Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2019-03-01Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-02-27Senatereturned to Education (S)
2019-02-27Senate1st reading
2019-02-27Senatetaken from Education (S)
2019-02-19Senateto Education (S)
2019-02-14Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback