KY SB219 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 094)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 094)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 247.232 to change the minimum age of an amusement ride or attraction operator to sixteen years of age; remove the definition of operator assistant; amend KRS 247.233 to change the parameters of an injury that would require the owner of an amusement ride or attraction to notify the Commissioner of Agriculture of any occurrence involving an amusement ride or attraction; amend KRS 247.236 to change the minimum age of an operator to sixteen years of age; remove all references to an operator assistant.
Title
AN ACT relating to amusement parks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 275 (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 861 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 861 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 094) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-6 |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | received in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2019-02-22 | Senate | returned to Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | returned to Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | taken from Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |