KY SB22 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 077)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to enact and enter into the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact with all other jurisdictions that legally join in the compact; declare the purpose of the compact; define terms; recognize a multistate licensure privilege to practice for physicians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 338 (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 809 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 077)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-14House3rd reading, passed 88-5
2019-03-14Housefloor amendments (2) and (3-title) withdrawn
2019-03-07Housefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3-title) filed
2019-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-21Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-20Housereceived in House
2019-02-19Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2019-02-15Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-01-08Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate
2018-12-13SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback