KY SB227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to prohibit a person from denying or depriving an infant of nourishment with the intent to cause or allow the death of an infant; prohibit a person from denying or depriving an infant of medically appropriate and reasonable medical care, medical treatment, or surgical care; require a physician performing an abortion to take all medically appropriate and reasonable steps to preserve the life and health of a born alive infant; provide that a born alive infant shall be treated as a legal person under the laws of the Commonwealth; specify that any born alive infant, whose parents declare they do not want to keep the infant, shall immediately upon birth become a ward of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; prohibit any person from performing scientific research on a born alive infant; specify that this section shall not be construed as preventing an infant's parent or guardian from refusing medical care that is not medically necessary; specify that the parent or guardian of a born alive infant shall not be held criminally or civilly liable for the actions of a physician, nurse, or other healthcare provider that acted without his or her consent; provide for civil and administrative penalties for violations of this Act; allow for severability; allow the General Assembly by joint resolution to appoint members to intervene as a matter or right in any case that challenges the constitutionality of this Act; amend KRS 311.595, 311.850, 314.091, and 315.121 to suspend or revoke the license of any physician, physician's assistant, nurse, or pharmacist who violates this Act; amend KRS 311.990 to establish criminal penalties for violations; establish the short title of "Born Alive Infant Protection Act"; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to abortion and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] | Sen. Matt Castlen [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Sen. Wil Schroder [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 883 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1) |
2019-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-01 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | received in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2019-02-26 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Nurses
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Reproductive Issues
Short Titles and Popular Names
Women
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Nurses
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Reproductive Issues
Short Titles and Popular Names
Women