KY SB227 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a Subchapter 14 under KRS Chapter 154 and create new sections thereof to allow the earn and learn tax credit in an amount up to 25% of the costs incurred by an approved company for tuition or other educational expenses paid on behalf of a qualified employee, not to exceed $1,500 and up to 50% of those costs incurred for a qualified employee in recovery, not to exceed $2,000; create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to allow the tax credit against the income taxes and the limited liability entity tax for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, but before January 1, 2025; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the tax credit; amend KRS 131.190 to allow the Department of Revenue to report to the General Assembly.
Title
AN ACT relating to the earn and learn tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb227.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb227/orig_bill.pdf |