KY SB23 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - reassigned to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - reassigned to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 315 to define terms; establish the insulin assistance program; establish the process by which individuals may qualify for the program; establish the process by which pharmacies may voluntarily participate in the program; establish an insulin product fee; establish reporting requirements; establish the insulin assistance fund; authorize the Kentucky Board of Pharmacy to promulgate administrative regulations necessary to carry out the provisions of this Act; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to insulin assistance and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | reassigned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb23.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb23/orig_bill.pdf |