KY SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 510 to create the offense of aggravated indecent exposure; amend KRS 194A.380 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to indecent exposure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |