KY SB246 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 172)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 172)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 154.12-100 to change the bond program to the economic development fund, replace the Capital Bonds and Oversight committee with the Kentucky Economic Development Finance Authority; amend KRS 154.25-010 to update definitions of agribusiness, eligible company, headquarters, manufacturing, and non-retail service or technology; amend KRS 154.32-020 to set the amount of economic development projects to $200,000,000 investment for inducements; and repeal KRS 154.32-080; amend KRS 154.32-030 and 154.32-090 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to economic development and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 984 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 309 (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 878 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 309 (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 878 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 172) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Bill passed 35-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (5) and (2-title) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (5) and (2-title) on Thursday, March 14 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-8 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendments (2-title) and (5) |
2019-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed, floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4) filed, floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-04 | House | returned to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-28 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | received in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2019-02-21 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |