KY SB250 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 336.010 to add definitions of "contractor," "person," "prime contractor," and "subcontractor"; amend KRS 336.040 to give authority to the Labor Cabinet for purposes of determining if a person is an employee or an independent contractor; provide the procedure for the determination; create a new section of KRS Chapter 336 to provide the elements for determining if someone is an independent contractor; limit prime contractor liability and eliminate employee benefits and wages for independent contractors; require the cabinet to notify certain governmental agencies that employee misclassification has occurred; amend KRS 336.050 to require the secretary of the Labor Cabinet to develop a training program to educate entrepreneurs and the public about classification of employees to begin no later than July 1, 2021; amend KRS 336.990 to add penalties for the misclassification of employees; Sections 1, 3 and 5 EFFECTIVE January 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to protection for entrepreneurs and workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Effective Dates, Delayed
Labor and Industry
Occupations and Professions
Personnel and Employment
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workers' Compensation
Effective Dates, Delayed
Labor and Industry
Occupations and Professions
Personnel and Employment
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workers' Compensation
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb250.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb250/orig_bill.pdf |