KY SB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.450 to make technical correction.
Title
AN ACT relating to public pensions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb257.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb257/orig_bill.pdf |