KY SB30 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - returned to Health and Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to limit the number of managed care organization (MCO) contracts to operate the Medicaid program to three.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to Medicaid managed care contracts and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1228 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-19House1st reading
2020-03-19Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-03Houseposted in committee
2020-02-18Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-02-13Housereceived in House
2020-02-12Senate3rd reading, passed 29-7 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-02-11Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-02-10Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-02-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 10, 2020
2020-02-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-01-16Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate
2019-08-20SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback