KY SB31 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 003)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 620.050 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services, in the case of siblings removed from their home who are not jointly placed, to provide for frequent visitation or other ongoing interaction between the siblings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to sibling visitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 154 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 790 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 003)
2019-02-27Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-02-27Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-02-27Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-11Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-02-08Housereceived in House
2019-02-07Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2019-02-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 7, 2019
2019-02-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-05Senate1st reading
2019-02-05Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2019-01-09Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate
2018-12-13SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback