KY SB34 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - posted in committee
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 117.025 to restrict voter registration data from being accessed, modified, or altered by any individual member of the State Board of Election, including the Secretary of the State and his or her staff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to elections and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, scta 1 RSN# 810 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25Houseposted in committee
2019-02-21Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2019-02-20Housereceived in House
2019-02-19Senate3rd reading, passed 27-8 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-15Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-13Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-12Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-12Senate1st reading
2019-02-12Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2019-01-08Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate
2018-12-14SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback