KY SB39 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require payments made by or on behalf of an insured for health care services, and the usual and customary rate of health care services received at a no or reduced cost health care facility, to apply toward any cost-sharing requirements under a health benefit plan; define terms; Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require the commissioner to promulgate administrative regulations; require the department to publish charge information. EFFECTIVE, January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to cost sharing under a health benefit plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Health
State Agencies
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Health
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb39.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb39/orig_bill.pdf |