KY SB4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 174 to establish the Kentucky Transportations Board; set forth membership, appointment, qualifications, and duties; outline board duties in relation to nomination and employment of the Transportation Cabinet secretary; require the board to establish a statewide prioritization process for the use of funds apportioned pursuant to 23 U.S.C. sec. 104, with some exceptions; identify 5 factors that form the basis for the objective scoring: congestion mitigation, economic development, accessibility. safety, and asset management; allow the board to weight factors differently in each highway district; require the board to develop the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; require advanced publication of recommended projects for the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan scored under the objective system, along with data regarding the scoring process; require advanced publication of bridge and pavement maintenance projects recommended for inclusion in the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; amend KRS 176.430 to require the board to develop the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; require the Department of Highways to notify the General Assembly, through the LRC, of any projects in the biennial highway construction plan which the department will not undertake in the year prescribed in the plan; amend KRS 48.110 to require the board to approve the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan before the Governor can submit the plan to the General Assembly; amend KRS 176.050 to require the Department of Highways to issue an annual list of bridge and pavement improvement needs, prioritized by safety and state of disrepair, from which the board will select projects for inclusion in the biennial highway construction plan and six-year road plan; amend KRS 45.247 to require that at the end of each fiscal year, any moneys in the highway construction contingency account in excess of 10% of the amount appropriated to that fund for that fiscal year will lapse to the state construction account; amend KRS 174.020 to attach the Kentucky Transportation Board to the Transportation Cabinet Office of the Secretary for administrative purposes; set forth staggered terms for initial appointments to the board.
Title
AN ACT relating to transportation and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa2, sfa4 RSN# 1242 (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1241 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1241 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | returned to Transportation (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | House | taken from Transportation (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Transportation (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Transportation (H) |
2020-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-24 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | received in House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | passed 25-8 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (2) and (4) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | floor amendment (3) defeated |
2020-02-20 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2020-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-18 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-14 | Senate | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 18, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-12 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-12 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-01-10 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Budget and Financial Administration
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation
Budget and Financial Administration
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation