KY SB5 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 6)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.0305, 243.130, and 243.170 to make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to promotional sampling of distilled spirits and wine and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 6) | |
2010-05-29 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-29 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-29 | received in House | |
2010-05-29 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Bill passed 22-12 | |
2010-05-28 | Senate concurred in House committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-05-28 | posted for passage for concurrence in House committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-05-28 | to Rules (S) | |
2010-05-28 | received in Senate | |
2010-05-28 | 3rd reading, passed 83-7 with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-05-28 | placed in the Orders of the Day for Friday, May 28, 2010 | |
2010-05-28 | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-05-27 | returned to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-27 | 2nd reading | |
2010-05-27 | taken from Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-27 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-05-26 | posting waived | |
2010-05-26 | returned to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-26 | 1st reading | |
2010-05-26 | taken from Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-26 | to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-26 | received in House | |
2010-05-26 | 3rd reading, passed 32-3 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-05-26 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, May 26, 2010 | |
2010-05-26 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-05-25 | returned to Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2010-05-25 | 2nd reading | |
2010-05-25 | taken from Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2010-05-24 | returned to Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2010-05-24 | 1st reading | |
2010-05-24 | taken from Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2010-05-24 | to Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2010-05-24 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10SS/SB5.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10SS/SB5/bill.doc |