KY SB5 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Propose to amend Section 95 of the Constitution of Kentucky to hold the election of the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Treasurer, Auditor of Public Accounts, Attorney General, Secretary of State, and Commissioner of Agriculture, Labor and Statistics in even-numbered years, every four years, beginning in 2028; provide transitional calendar; submit to the voters for ratification or rejection. Provide ballot language.
Title
AN ACT proposing to amend Section 95 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to the election of state officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Christian McDaniel [R] | Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Sen. Rick Girdler [R] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 779 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2019-01-11 | House | received in House |
2019-01-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-4 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 10, 2019 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-01-08 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
Attorney General
Auditor of Public Accounts
Constitution, Ky.
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Governor
Lieutenant Governor
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Secretary of State
Treasurer
Attorney General
Auditor of Public Accounts
Constitution, Ky.
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
Governor
Lieutenant Governor
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Secretary of State
Treasurer