KY SB5 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 65A to require proposed increases in ad valorem taxes and certain fees and the levy of new ad valorem taxes or fees by special purpose governmental entities to be submitted to the legislative body of the county or city in which the special purpose governmental entity is located for review; amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to conform; repeal KRS 65A.100; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to special purpose governmental entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 358 (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1435 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hcs1 FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1409 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 270 (Y: 49 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1161 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1435 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hcs1 FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1409 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 270 (Y: 49 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1161 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 90) |
2020-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | Senate | bill passed 56-30 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | veto overridden in House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2020-04-14 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | received in House |
2020-04-14 | House | bill passed 26-7 |
2020-04-14 | House | veto overridden in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2020-04-14 | House | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-14 | House | veto message received in Senate |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Vetoed |
2020-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | Senate | passed 24-4 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 49-33 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-28 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-24 | House | received in House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-10 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 23, 2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-01-10 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Government
Local Mandate
Special Districts
Special Purpose Governmental Entities
Taxation
Taxation, Property
Counties
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Government
Local Mandate
Special Districts
Special Purpose Governmental Entities
Taxation
Taxation, Property