KY SB54 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 75.031 to require fire districts that operate in a consolidated local government and one neighboring county have one member of the board of trustees appointed from the neighboring county.
Title
AN ACT relating to fire protection districts in consolidated local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-03 | passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute (2), floor amendment (2-title) | |
2011-03-03 | floor amendment (3) amendment reconsidered (change PASSED status) | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Substitute (1) reconsidered | |
2011-03-03 | placed in the Orders of the Day | |
2011-03-03 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) | |
2011-03-03 | returned to Local Government (H) | |
2011-03-03 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-03-03 | returned to the Orders of the Day | |
2011-03-03 | floor amendment (1) ruled not germane | |
2011-03-03 | floor amendment (3) adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Substitute adopted | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd reading | |
2011-03-03 | floor amendments (4) (6) and (7) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (5-title) and (8-title) filed | |
2011-03-02 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-03-01 | floor amendments (1) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed | |
2011-03-01 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 2, 2011 | |
2011-03-01 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-28 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-24 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-18 | to Local Government (H) | |
2011-02-17 | received in House | |
2011-02-16 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2011-02-15 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 16, 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2011-02-09 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-09 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-09 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-06 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB54.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB54/bill.doc |