KY SB54 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 190)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 190)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require an insurer develop processes for electronic prior authorizations; to establish an extended length of authorization under certain circumstances; amend KRS 205.522 to require the Department for Medicaid Services or a Medicaid managed care organization to comply with Sections 1, 6, 7, 8, and 9 of this Act; amend KRS 217.211 to require governmental units of the Commonwealth to promulgate administrative regulations for electronic prescribing that include electronic prior authorization standards meeting certain requirements; amend KRS 218A.171 to require governmental units of the Commonwealth to promulgate administrative regulations for electronic prescribing that include electronic prior authorization standards meeting certain requirements; amend KRS 304.17A-005 to define "health care services," "health facility" or "facility," and "medically necessary health care services"; amend KRS 304.17A-580 to prohibit a requirement of a utilization review for the provision of emergency health care services; to establish a presumption of medical necessity; amend KRS 304.17A-600 to amend the definition of "prospective review" to include prior authorization, step therapy, preadmission review, pretreatment review, and utilization and case management; amend KRS 304.17A-603 to require certain written procedures of insurers be accessible on its Web site; amend KRS 304.17A-607 to require that decisions relating to utilization reviews are conducted by physicians of the same specialty as the ordering provider; to establish a time frame for providing utilization decisions; to allow for electronic format of certain required notices; to establish that an insurer's failure to respond within set time frames shall be deemed a prior authorization; amend 304.17A-430, to conform; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to prior authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 978 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 277 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1 RSN# 827 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 277 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1 RSN# 827 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 190) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Bill passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) on Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-25 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2019-02-22 | House | received in House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2018-12-14 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Boards and Commissions
Cities
Counties
Health and Medical Services
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Local Government
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies
Unified Local Governments
Boards and Commissions
Cities
Counties
Health and Medical Services
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Local Government
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies
Unified Local Governments