KY SB57 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 188)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 188)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.073 to allow discretionary expungement of Class D felonies with a ten-year waiting period; amend KRS 431.076 to allow a person against whom charges have been dismissed with or without prejudice to petition for expungement; set time limits for filing petitions; amend KRS 431.079 to require a certificate of eligibility only if a petition or application seeks expungement of a conviction; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to create an expungement fund and specify distribution of money from the fund; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to expungement and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1059 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 341 (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, sfa 2 RSN# 876 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 341 (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, sfa 2 RSN# 876 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 188) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Bill passed 36-1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (4) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (4) on Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (4) |
2019-03-13 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-12 | House | floor amendment (2) withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2019-03-04 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-28 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | received in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |