KY SB60 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 187)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 187)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 83A.045, 118.165, and 118A.060 to change the filing deadline for certain candidates for election from the last Tuesday in January to the first Friday following the first Monday in January; amend KRS 118.367 to change the deadline for filing a statement-of-candidacy form from April 1 to the first Friday following the first Monday in January; amend various sections to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Christian McDaniel [R] | Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] |
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 336 (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 845 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 845 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 187) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 60-37 |
2019-03-14 | House | floor amendment (1) ruled not germane |
2019-03-14 | House | 3rd reading |
2019-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | received in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Cities
Congressional Districts
County Clerks
Courts
Elections and Voting
General Assembly
Judges and Court Commissioners
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Congressional Districts
County Clerks
Courts
Elections and Voting
General Assembly
Judges and Court Commissioners
Secretary of State
State Agencies