KY SB63 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.100 to include virtual high school completion programs, give local board authority to establish program, identify the purpose of such programs, outline enrollment eligibility requirements, identify graduation requirements for enrollees of the program, authorize schools to charge students tuition and fees for the program, require that an enrollee in the program be at least 21 years old, establish school requirements for eligibility, and allow a district to choose between requiring completion of graduation requirements at the time of drop out or the requirements in place currently.
Title
AN ACT relating to high school programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hfa1 RSN# 1290 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 177 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1187 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 177 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1187 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 17) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-10 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-09 | Senate | passed 34-0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (1) on Monday, March 9 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-1 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-03 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | received in House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-30 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |