KY SB65 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 084)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 211 to define terms; establish the Palliative Care Interdisciplinary Advisory Council within the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; establish membership and duties; establish the Palliative Care Consumer and Professional Information and Education Program within the cabinet; set forth purposes, duties, and requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to patient quality of life.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 945 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 257 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 813 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 084)
2019-03-13Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-12SenateBill passed 37-0
2019-03-12SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-07House3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-28Houseposted in committee
2019-02-21Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-02-20Housereceived in House
2019-02-19Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2019-02-14Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-01-10Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback