KY SB67 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 184)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 184)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 525 to establish the offense of sexual crimes against an animal; define "animal" and "sexual contact"; list exceptions including, animal husbandry; amend KRS 436.605 to add sexual crimes against an animal to the list of crimes for which an animal control officer may utilize peace officer powers.
Title
AN ACT relating to sexual crimes against animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Paul Hornback [R] |
Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 982 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 313 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 818 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 313 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 818 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 184) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Bill passed 35-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendment (3) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendment (3) on Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with floor amendment (3) |
2019-03-13 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2019-03-12 | House | floor amendments (1), (2-title) and (3) filed |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | received in House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement