KY SB72 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 74)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 508 to define "female genital mutilation" and create the Class B felony of female genital mutilation; create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to require the Department for Public Health in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to develop, produce, and disseminate educational materials related to female genital mutilation; amend KRS 15.334 to require law enforcement training on female genital mutilation; amend KRS 311.595 to require a conviction of female genital mutilation to result in mandatory revocation of a physician's license; create a new section of KRS Chapter 413 to permit civil action for female genital mutilation for ten years; amend KRS 620.020 to include female genital mutilation in the definition of "abused or neglected child"; amend KRS 620.030 to provide that if a person knows or has reasonable cause to believe that a child is a victim of female genital mutilation, then that person shall immediately make an oral or written report to the appropriate authorities; create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to require a report on female genital mutilation reports to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to female genital mutilation and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hcta1 FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1414 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 315 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1155 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02Senatesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 74)
2020-03-26Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-03-26Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-26Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-26Senatepassed 31-0
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred in House committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-26Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 84-0 with committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-17Housereturned to Rules
2020-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
2020-03-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title)
2020-01-31Houseposted in committee
2020-01-24Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-01-22Housereceived in House
2020-01-22Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2020-01-21Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2020-01-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-08Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback