KY SB75 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.050 to provide an alternative lighting system for motorless vehicles operated on a highway at night; amend KRS 189.820 to provide for an alternative means of marking motorless, slow-moving vehicles with reflective tape rather than using the slow-moving vehicle emblem; amend KRS 189.930 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to slow-moving vehicles and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 53) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-27 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 75-21 | |
2012-03-14 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2012 | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-13 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-03-12 | posting waived | |
2012-02-08 | to Transportation (H) | |
2012-02-07 | received in House | |
2012-02-07 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendments (1-title) and (2) | |
2012-02-06 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-02 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-01 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 2, 2012 | |
2012-01-26 | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed | |
2012-01-26 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-25 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-01-05 | to Transportation (S) | |
2012-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB75.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB75/bill.doc |