KY SB75 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.070 to permit the commissioner of education to grant the equivalent of ten instructional days for school districts that have missed an average of 20 or more days in the previous 3 years and use alternative methods of instruction on days when the school district is closed for specific reasons; require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations for calculating average daily attendance for instructional time granted.
Title
AN ACT relating to school instructional days.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 107) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2013-03-11 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2013 |
2013-03-11 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-07 | House | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2013-03-04 | House | posting waived |
2013-03-04 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | 2nd reading |
2013-03-04 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2013-03-01 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2013-03-01 | House | 1st reading |
2013-03-01 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | received in House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-02-20 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-02-20 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB75.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB75/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB75/vote_history.pdf |