KY SB79 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.380, relating to the employment of school personnel, to define "administrative findings of child abuse or neglect" to mean a substantiated finding of child abuse or neglect that is upheld on appeal or not appealed; amend the definition of "clear CA/N check" to include administrative findings instead of substantiated findings; remove the requirement that an existing school district employee self-report a substantiated finding of child abuse or neglect to the superintendent.
Title
AN ACT relating to school background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 233 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1168 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1168 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 32) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-17 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2020-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-31 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | received in House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Background Checks
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
State Agencies
State Employees
Teachers
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
State Agencies
State Employees
Teachers