KY SB8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 030)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 161.770 to specify that a board of education must comply with the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990, the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996, and any other applicable federal law in placing a teacher or superintendent on leave due to a physical or mental disability; prohibit a board from requesting unnecessary medical information or disclosing any medical information; amend KRS 161.790 to clarify the causes for which a contract of a teacher may be terminated; require an attorney to serve as hearing officer and chairman of the tribunal; remove the lay person from the tribunal; establish selection and training requirements for hearing officers; establish a prehearing conference for motions and mediation; establish tribunal's decision as a recommended order and allow parties to file exceptions to recommended order; allow hearing officer to respond to exceptions by entering original recommended order or an amended order as a final order; limit decisions to upholding or overturning the decision of the superintendent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to educators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 235 (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 783 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 030)
2019-03-07Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-07Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-07Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-07Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-06House3rd reading, passed 56-42
2019-03-06Housefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2019-03-01Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2019
2019-02-26House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-25Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-05Housereceived in House
2019-01-11Senate3rd reading, passed 23-13 with floor amendment (1)
2019-01-10Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-01-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 11, 2019
2019-01-10Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2019-01-09Senatereturned to Education (S)
2019-01-09Senate2nd reading
2019-01-09Senatetaken from Education (S)
2019-01-08Senateto Education (S)
2019-01-08Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senate1st reading
2019-01-08Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback