KY SB82 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 210 to establish the Kentucky Eating Disorder Council in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; set forth membership and duties; require a report annually beginning December 1, 2020; sunset the council on December 1, 2030, unless otherwise reestablished by the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT establishing the Kentucky Eating Disorder Council and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 316 (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1219 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Senatesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 56)
2020-03-19Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 79-5
2020-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-17Housereturned to Rules
2020-03-04Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2020
2020-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-25Houseposted in committee
2020-02-13Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-02-11Housereceived in House
2020-02-10Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-02-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 10, 2020
2020-02-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-01-13Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-09Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback