KY SB98 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 102)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 102)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 164.740 to 164.7891 to establish the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship; require the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to administer the scholarship; define eligibility requirements for the scholarship; define the scholarship award amount; require the authority to prepare an annual report on the scholarship in collaboration with the Office for Education and Workforce Statistics; create the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship fund; confirm Executive Order 2018-571; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 367 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 814 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 814 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 102) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-0 |
2019-03-14 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2019-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-04 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-02-21 | House | to Education (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | received in House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Reorganization
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Appropriations
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Reorganization
Reports Mandated
State Agencies