KY SCR154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to examine Kentucky's recent response to the hepatitis A outbreak and make recommendations to make future responses to outbreaks more effective.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to examine Kentucky's recent response to the hepatitis A outbreak and make recommendations to make future responses to outbreaks more effective.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1007 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |