KY SJR111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - to Transportation (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet to designate all parking spaces next to the "rose garden" on the East side of the Capitol Annex as accessible.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet to designate certain parking spaces as accessible.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 936 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | 1st reading |
2019-03-12 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | received in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-04 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |