KY SJR173 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to create the Task Force on Exceptional Support Waiver Services; require a report to the Governor, General Assembly, and the Interim Joint Committee on Health, Welfare, and Family Services by August 1, 2021.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to create the Task Force on Exceptional Support Waiver Services to study exceptional support services and the Kentucky Exceptional Supports Protocol provided through the Supports for Community Living Waiver Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1301 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-12 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-10 | House | received in House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Health and Medical Services
Housing, Building, and Construction
Public Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Task Forces, Executive Branch
Housing, Building, and Construction
Public Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Task Forces, Executive Branch