KY SJR35 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Direct the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish the Task Force on Services for Persons with Brain Injuries; establish duties of the task force; establish members of the task force; require a report to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2020; cease the task force by December 31, 2020, unless otherwise authorized by the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish the Task Force on Services for Persons with Brain Injuries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1264 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houseposted in committee
2020-03-05Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-03Housereceived in House
2020-03-02Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2020-02-28Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2020
2020-02-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-26Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-09Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback