KY SR10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Judge Charles T. Moore upon the occasion of his retirement.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring Judge Charles T. Moore upon the occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sr10.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sr10/orig_bill.pdf |