KY SR120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Kentucky farmers and recognize February 29 to March 4, 2016, as Food Checkout Week.
Title
Honor Kentucky farmers and recognize February 29 to March 4, 2016, as Food Checkout Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2016-02-11 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2016-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SR120.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SR120/bill.pdf |