KY SR158 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - adopted 38-0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Confirm the appointment of Stephanie L. Kinney as an administrative law judge in the Department of Workers' Claims for a term expiring December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm the appointment of Stephanie L. Kinney as an administrative law judge in the Department of Workers' Claims for a term expiring December 31, 2017.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-24Senateadopted 38-0
2015-03-23Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 23, 2015
2015-03-09Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2015-03-02Senateto Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
2015-02-27Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback