KY SR170 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Recognize pornography as a public health crisis, acknowledge the need for education on the harmful effects of pornography, encourage prosecution of obscenity and exploitation offenses, and commend law enforcement efforts to fight Internet crimes against children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognize pornography as a public health crisis, acknowledge the need for education on the harmful effects of pornography, encourage prosecution of obscenity and exploitation offenses, and commend law enforcement efforts to fight Internet crimes against children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29Senateadopted by voice vote
2018-03-08Senateto Senate Floor
2018-03-08Senatetaken from Rules
2018-03-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-02-13Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-02-12Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback