KY SR283 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-15 - defeated 15-19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-15 - defeated 15-19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the appointment of Marianne Butler to the Governor's Postsecondary Education Nominating Committee for a term expiring April 14, 2024.
Title
A RESOLUTION confirming the appointment of Marianne Butler to the Governor's Postsecondary Education Nominating Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1467 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Senate | defeated 15-19 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | introduced in Senate |