KY SR41 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declare March 10, 2020 to be Alzheimer's Awareness and Advocacy Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION declaring March 10, 2020, to be Alzheimer's Awareness and Advocacy Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Rick Girdler [R] | Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Wil Schroder [R] |
Sen. George Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sr41.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sr41/orig_bill.pdf |