LA HB129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Notice House sustained the Governor's veto.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Notice House sustained the Governor's veto.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain Department of Wildlife and Fisheries projects from the capital outlay process (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Exempts certain Department of Wildlife and Fisheries projects from the capital outlay process (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 129 SUSTAIN GOV'S VETO (#4) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 129 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#800) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#33) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 129 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#800) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#657) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#33) (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Notice House sustained the Governor's veto. |
2018-05-23 | House | Veto message received and read. By a vote of 79 yeas and 0 nays, veto sustained. |
2018-05-22 | House | Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. (Hand delivered on 05/20/18.) |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/08/18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18. |
2018-03-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. |
2018-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |