LA HB16 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for eligible expenses incurred in the rehabilitation of historic structures included on the National Register of Historic Places (Item #19) (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Establishes a tax credit for eligible expenses incurred in the rehabilitation of historic structures included on the National Register of Historic Places (Item #19) (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Vote on HB 16 FINAL PASSAGE (#59) (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-06-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 38. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20. |
2020-06-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-11 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |