LA HB172 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Names Grand Isle bivalve hatchery the "Michael C. Voisin Hatchery"
Title
Names Grand Isle bivalve hatchery the "Michael C. Voisin Hatchery"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#379) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 172, FINAL PASSAGE (#37) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 172, FINAL PASSAGE (#37) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2. |
2013-05-16 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2013. |
2013-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. |
2013-03-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-03-20 | House | Prefiled. |