LA HB172 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to credit for time served pending a technical parole violation (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to credit for time served pending a technical parole violation (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#779) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Vote on HB 172 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 213. |
2016-05-19 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/30/2016. |
2016-03-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-02-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016. |
2016-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |