LA HB185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the registration of persons convicted of terrorism offenses and offenses against peace officers (EG1 +$65,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the registration of persons convicted of terrorism offenses and offenses against peace officers (EG1 +$65,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 185 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#878) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 185 FINAL PASSAGE (#839) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 185 FINAL PASSAGE (#554) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 185 FINAL PASSAGE (#839) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 185 FINAL PASSAGE (#554) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 298. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 104, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (10-0-1). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |