LA HB2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Title
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 2 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1058) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1041) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#917) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#760) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1041) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#917) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#760) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2019. |
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 20. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Alario, and LaFleur. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Abramson, Stefanski, and Jimmy Harris. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-16 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 05/23/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2019-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-05-13 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2019-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-16 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |