LA HB21 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Effective date: 08/29/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Effective date: 08/29/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to motor vehicle repairs (Item #39)
Title
Provides relative to motor vehicle repairs (Item #39)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 21 FINAL PASSAGE (#77) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 21 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 21 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | House | Effective date: 08/29/2020. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 4. |
2020-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2020-06-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-06-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-06-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/11/20. |
2020-06-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-08 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2020-06-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |