LA HB229 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to the use of a wireless telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to the use of a wireless telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#652) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 229 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-23HouseNotice given.
2019-05-23HouseNotice removed
2019-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-22HouseNotice given.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 45. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2019-05-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-14HouseNotice given.
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19.
2019-05-08HouseNotice given.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-29HouseReported with amendments (13-2).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB229&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119328
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128486
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139261
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128193
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128192
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128297
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132535
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132778
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132610
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136291
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136452
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136449
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119339
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128828
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139276
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139133

Bill Comments

feedback